Viscount Allenby of Megiddo
MNIS ID: 3484
Committee memberships
-
Personal Bills Committee
10 December 2003 - 8 April 2010
Member
-
Procedure and Privileges Committee
1 December 1999 - 7 November 2002
Member
-
Administration and Works Committee (Lords)
17 December 1998 - 11 November 1999
Member
-
Adminstration Sub Committee
5 June 1997 - 19 November 1998
Member
-
Select Committee on Science and Technology Sub-Committee 2
24 October 1996 - 8 April 1997
Member
-
House of Lords Offices Committee
22 November 1995 - 19 November 1998
Member
-
Committee of Selection (Lords)
17 November 1995 - 19 November 1998
Member
-
Refreshment Sub Committee
6 December 1988 - 8 April 1997
Member
-
House of Lords Offices Committee
6 December 1988 - 22 October 1991
Member